E
|
06/17/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
05/29/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5697
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3106
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5207
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5213
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4771
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2330
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2330
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2330
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2330
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2330
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2330
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2330
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1946
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1844
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1555
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3137
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#919
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3121
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3121
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2811
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 842
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 842
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|