Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3441 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/12/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R10533 JRJ-D
 By: Riddle H.B. No. 3441


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the date of the election for trustees of an independent
 school district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.0581(a), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  An election for trustees of an independent school
 district shall be held on the same date as[:
 [(1)   the election for the members of the governing body
 of a municipality located in the school district;
 [(2)] the general election for state and county
 officers or the date of the general primary election[;
 [(3)   the election for the members of the governing body
 of a hospital district, if the school district:
 [(A)     is wholly or partly located in a county with
 a population of less than 40,000 that is adjacent to a county with a
 population of more than three million; and
 [(B)     held its election for trustees jointly with
 the election for the members of the governing body of the hospital
 district before May 2007; or
 [(4)     the election for the members of the governing
 board of a public junior college district in which the school
 district is wholly or partly located].
 SECTION 2.  Sections 11.059(a) and (e), Education Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A trustee of an independent school district serves a
 term of [three or] four years.
 (e)  Not later than December 31, 2015 [2011], the board of
 trustees may adopt a resolution changing the length of the terms of
 its trustees.  The resolution must provide for staggered terms of
 [either three or] four years and specify the manner in which the
 transition from the length of the former term to the modified term
 is made.  The transition must begin with the first regular election
 for trustees that occurs after January 1, 2016 [2012], and a trustee
 who serves on that date shall serve the remainder of that
 term.  This subsection expires January 1, 2021 [2017].
 SECTION 3.  The heading to Section 41.0052, Election Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 41.0052.  [CHANGING] GENERAL ELECTION DATE OF POLITICAL
 SUBDIVISION OTHER THAN COUNTY.
 SECTION 4.  Sections 41.0052(a) and (e), Election Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The governing body of a political subdivision, other
 than a county, that holds its general election for officers on a
 date other than the November uniform election date or the date of
 the general primary election shall [may], not later than December
 31, 2016 [2012], change the date on which it holds its general
 election for officers to the November uniform election date or the
 date of the general primary election.
 (e)  The governing body of a newly incorporated city may, not
 later than the second anniversary of the date of incorporation,
 change the date on which it holds its general election for officers
 to another authorized [uniform] election date.
 SECTION 5.  Section 11.059(b), Education Code, and Section
 41.005, Election Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.