By: Davis of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 3517 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015; May 12, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE VOTE YeaNayAbsentPNV HuffmanX EllisX BirdwellX CreightonX EstesX FraserX NelsonX SchwertnerX ZaffiriniX A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to requirements governing registration and authorized activities of certain lobbyists; expanding the applicability of an occupational registration. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 305.0041(a), Government Code, is amended to read as follows: (a) A person is not required to register under this chapter in accordance with Section 305.003(a)(2) solely because the person receives or is entitled to receive compensation or reimbursement to: (1) communicate as an employee of a vendor of a product or service to a member of the executive branch concerning state agency purchasing decisions that do not exceed 10 million dollars involving a product, service, or service provider or negotiations regarding such decisions; (2) communicate as an employee of a vendor of a product or service to a member of the executive branch concerning state agency purchasing decisions that exceed 10 million dollars involving a product, service, or service provider or negotiations regarding such decisions if the compensation for the communication is not totally or partially contingent on the outcome of any administrative action; (3) [communicate in a capacity other than as an employee of a vendor of a product or service to a member of the executive branch concerning state agency purchasing decisions involving a product, service, or service provider or negotiations regarding such decisions if the compensation for the communication is not totally or partially contingent on the outcome of any administrative action; [(4)] communicate as a member of an advisory committee or task force if the person is appointed to serve in that capacity by a member of the legislative or executive branch; or (4) [(5)] communicate as a member of a board, task force, or advisory committee on which a member of the legislative or executive branch also serves. SECTION 2. Sections 305.022(c-1) and (c-3), Government Code, are repealed. SECTION 3. A person who is required to register under Chapter 305, Government Code, solely as a result of the change in law made by this Act to Section 305.0041(a), Government Code, is not required to register under that chapter before January 1, 2016. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. * * * * *