1 | | - | By: Davis of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 3517 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015; |
---|
3 | | - | May 12, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State |
---|
4 | | - | Affairs; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
5 | | - | Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | H.B. No. 3517 |
---|
21 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
22 | 5 | | relating to requirements governing registration and authorized |
---|
23 | 6 | | activities of certain lobbyists; expanding the applicability of an |
---|
24 | 7 | | occupational registration. |
---|
25 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
26 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Section 305.0041(a), Government Code, is amended |
---|
27 | 10 | | to read as follows: |
---|
28 | 11 | | (a) A person is not required to register under this chapter |
---|
29 | 12 | | in accordance with Section 305.003(a)(2) solely because the person |
---|
30 | 13 | | receives or is entitled to receive compensation or reimbursement |
---|
31 | 14 | | to: |
---|
32 | 15 | | (1) communicate as an employee of a vendor of a product |
---|
33 | 16 | | or service to a member of the executive branch concerning state |
---|
34 | 17 | | agency purchasing decisions that do not exceed 10 million dollars |
---|
35 | 18 | | involving a product, service, or service provider or negotiations |
---|
36 | 19 | | regarding such decisions; |
---|
37 | 20 | | (2) communicate as an employee of a vendor of a product |
---|
38 | 21 | | or service to a member of the executive branch concerning state |
---|
39 | 22 | | agency purchasing decisions that exceed 10 million dollars |
---|
40 | 23 | | involving a product, service, or service provider or negotiations |
---|
41 | 24 | | regarding such decisions if the compensation for the communication |
---|
42 | 25 | | is not totally or partially contingent on the outcome of any |
---|
43 | 26 | | administrative action; |
---|
44 | 27 | | (3) [communicate in a capacity other than as an |
---|
45 | 28 | | employee of a vendor of a product or service to a member of the |
---|
46 | 29 | | executive branch concerning state agency purchasing decisions |
---|
47 | 30 | | involving a product, service, or service provider or negotiations |
---|
48 | 31 | | regarding such decisions if the compensation for the communication |
---|
49 | 32 | | is not totally or partially contingent on the outcome of any |
---|
50 | 33 | | administrative action; |
---|
51 | 34 | | [(4)] communicate as a member of an advisory committee |
---|
52 | 35 | | or task force if the person is appointed to serve in that capacity |
---|
53 | 36 | | by a member of the legislative or executive branch; or |
---|
54 | 37 | | (4) [(5)] communicate as a member of a board, task |
---|
55 | 38 | | force, or advisory committee on which a member of the legislative or |
---|
56 | 39 | | executive branch also serves. |
---|
57 | 40 | | SECTION 2. Sections 305.022(c-1) and (c-3), Government |
---|
58 | 41 | | Code, are repealed. |
---|
59 | 42 | | SECTION 3. A person who is required to register under |
---|
60 | 43 | | Chapter 305, Government Code, solely as a result of the change in |
---|
61 | 44 | | law made by this Act to Section 305.0041(a), Government Code, is not |
---|
62 | 45 | | required to register under that chapter before January 1, 2016. |
---|
63 | 46 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
64 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 47 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 48 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 49 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 3517 was passed by the House on May 7, |
---|
| 50 | + | 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 1, 2 present, not |
---|
| 51 | + | voting. |
---|
| 52 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 53 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 54 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 3517 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
| 55 | + | 26, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
| 56 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 57 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 58 | + | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
| 59 | + | Date |
---|
| 60 | + | _____________________ |
---|
| 61 | + | Governor |
---|