Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3517 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Davis of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 3517
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 12, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 HuffmanX
 EllisX
 BirdwellX
 CreightonX
 EstesX
 FraserX
 NelsonX
 SchwertnerX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requirements governing registration and authorized
 activities of certain lobbyists; expanding the applicability of an
 occupational registration.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 305.0041(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  A person is not required to register under this chapter
 in accordance with Section 305.003(a)(2) solely because the person
 receives or is entitled to receive compensation or reimbursement
 to:
 (1)  communicate as an employee of a vendor of a product
 or service to a member of the executive branch concerning state
 agency purchasing decisions that do not exceed 10 million dollars
 involving a product, service, or service provider or negotiations
 regarding such decisions;
 (2)  communicate as an employee of a vendor of a product
 or service to a member of the executive branch concerning state
 agency purchasing decisions that exceed 10 million dollars
 involving a product, service, or service provider or negotiations
 regarding such decisions if the compensation for the communication
 is not totally or partially contingent on the outcome of any
 administrative action;
 (3)  [communicate in a capacity other than as an
 employee of a vendor of a product or service to a member of the
 executive branch concerning state agency purchasing decisions
 involving a product, service, or service provider or negotiations
 regarding such decisions if the compensation for the communication
 is not totally or partially contingent on the outcome of any
 administrative action;
 [(4)]  communicate as a member of an advisory committee
 or task force if the person is appointed to serve in that capacity
 by a member of the legislative or executive branch; or
 (4) [(5)]  communicate as a member of a board, task
 force, or advisory committee on which a member of the legislative or
 executive branch also serves.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 305.022(c-1) and (c-3), Government
 Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 3.  A person who is required to register under
 Chapter 305, Government Code, solely as a result of the change in
 law made by this Act to Section 305.0041(a), Government Code, is not
 required to register under that chapter before January 1, 2016.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *