E
|
06/20/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6020
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5402
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1705
|
Journal Page: 5402
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5402
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4980
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2422
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2422
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2422
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2422
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2422
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2422
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2422
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Perry
|
Journal Page: 2420
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2420
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2420
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2026
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1896
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1742
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1742
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1631
|
House
|
05/17/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3788
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3640
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1161
|
Journal Page: 3640
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3640
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Amended
|
2-Hughes
|
Journal Page: 3638
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3633
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3540
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1113
|
Journal Page: 3540
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3540
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3540
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2965
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1647
|
House
|
03/20/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 898
|
House
|
03/20/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 898
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|