LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB3579
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB3579
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB3579
Compare Versions
HB3579 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3579 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3579 Enrolled May 30, 2015
HB3579 Comm Sub May 24, 2015
HB3579 Engrossed May 17, 2015
HB3579 Introduced March 12, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB3579 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3579 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3579 Enrolled May 30, 2015
HB3579 Comm Sub May 24, 2015
HB3579 Engrossed May 17, 2015
HB3579 Introduced March 12, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare