1 | 1 | | 84R14907 T |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Keffer H.B. No. 3597 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to exports of groundwater from a groundwater conservation |
---|
8 | 8 | | district. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. SECTION 1. Section 36.122, Water Code, is |
---|
11 | 11 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | Sec. 36.122. EXPORT [TRANSFER] OF GROUNDWATER OUT OF |
---|
13 | 13 | | DISTRICT. (a) If an application for a permit or an amendment to a |
---|
14 | 14 | | permit under Section 36.113 proposes the export [transfer] of |
---|
15 | 15 | | groundwater outside of a district's boundaries, the district may |
---|
16 | 16 | | also consider the provisions of this section in determining whether |
---|
17 | 17 | | to grant or deny the permit or permit amendment. |
---|
18 | 18 | | (b) A district may promulgate rules requiring a person to |
---|
19 | 19 | | obtain a permit or an amendment to a permit under Section 36.113 |
---|
20 | 20 | | from the district [for the transfer of] to export groundwater [out |
---|
21 | 21 | | of the district] to: |
---|
22 | 22 | | (1) increase, on or after March 2, 1997, the amount of |
---|
23 | 23 | | groundwater to be [transferred] exported under a continuing |
---|
24 | 24 | | arrangement in effect before that date; or |
---|
25 | 25 | | (2) [transfer] export groundwater [out of the |
---|
26 | 26 | | district] on or after March 2, 1997, under a new arrangement. |
---|
27 | 27 | | (c) Except as provided in Section 36.113(e), the district |
---|
28 | 28 | | may not impose more restrictive permit conditions on [transporters] |
---|
29 | 29 | | exporters than the district imposes on existing in-district users. |
---|
30 | 30 | | The district may not deny a permit based on the fact that the |
---|
31 | 31 | | applicant seeks to export groundwater. A district may not prohibit |
---|
32 | 32 | | the export of groundwater. |
---|
33 | 33 | | (d) The district may impose a reasonable fee for processing |
---|
34 | 34 | | an application under this section. The fee may not exceed fees that |
---|
35 | 35 | | the district imposes for processing other applications under |
---|
36 | 36 | | Section 36.113. An application filed to comply with this section |
---|
37 | 37 | | shall be considered and processed under the same procedures as |
---|
38 | 38 | | other applications for permits under Section 36.113 and shall be |
---|
39 | 39 | | combined with applications filed to obtain a permit for in-district |
---|
40 | 40 | | water use under Section 36.113 from the same applicant. |
---|
41 | 41 | | (e) The district may impose an export [a reasonable] fee or |
---|
42 | 42 | | surcharge [for an export fee] using one of the following methods: |
---|
43 | 43 | | (1) a fee negotiated between the district and the |
---|
44 | 44 | | exporter [transporter]; |
---|
45 | 45 | | (2) a rate not to exceed the equivalent of the |
---|
46 | 46 | | district's tax rate per hundred dollars of valuation for each |
---|
47 | 47 | | thousand gallons of water exported from [transferred out of] the |
---|
48 | 48 | | district or 2.5 cents per thousand gallons of water, if the district |
---|
49 | 49 | | assesses a tax rate of less than 2.5 cents per hundred dollars of |
---|
50 | 50 | | valuation; or |
---|
51 | 51 | | (3) for a fee-based district, a 50 percent export |
---|
52 | 52 | | surcharge, in addition to the district's production fee, for water |
---|
53 | 53 | | exported from [transferred out of] the district. |
---|
54 | 54 | | [(f) In reviewing a proposed transfer of groundwater out of |
---|
55 | 55 | | the district, the district shall consider: |
---|
56 | 56 | | (1) the availability of water in the district and in |
---|
57 | 57 | | the proposed receiving area during the period for which the water |
---|
58 | 58 | | supply is requested; |
---|
59 | 59 | | (2) the projected effect of the proposed transfer on |
---|
60 | 60 | | aquifer conditions, depletion, subsidence, or effects on existing |
---|
61 | 61 | | permit holders or other groundwater users within the district; and |
---|
62 | 62 | | (3) the approved regional water plan and approved |
---|
63 | 63 | | district management plan. |
---|
64 | 64 | | (g) The district may not deny a permit based on the fact that |
---|
65 | 65 | | the applicant seeks to transfer groundwater outside of the district |
---|
66 | 66 | | but may limit a permit issued under this section if conditions in |
---|
67 | 67 | | Subsection (f) warrant the limitation, subject to Subsection (c)]. |
---|
68 | 68 | | (h) In addition to conditions provided by Section 36.1131, |
---|
69 | 69 | | the permit shall specify: |
---|
70 | 70 | | (1) the amount of water that may be exported from |
---|
71 | 71 | | [transferred out of] the district; and |
---|
72 | 72 | | (2) the period for which the water may be exported |
---|
73 | 73 | | [transferred]. |
---|
74 | 74 | | (i) The period specified by Subsection (h)(2) shall be: |
---|
75 | 75 | | (1) at least three years if construction of a |
---|
76 | 76 | | conveyance system has not been initiated prior to the issuance of |
---|
77 | 77 | | the permit; or |
---|
78 | 78 | | (2) at least 30 years if construction of a conveyance |
---|
79 | 79 | | system has been initiated prior to the issuance of the permit. |
---|
80 | 80 | | (j) A term under Subsection (i)(1) shall automatically be |
---|
81 | 81 | | extended to the terms agreed to under Subsection (i)(2) if |
---|
82 | 82 | | construction of a conveyance system is begun before the expiration |
---|
83 | 83 | | of the initial term. |
---|
84 | 84 | | [(k) Notwithstanding the period specified in Subsections |
---|
85 | 85 | | (i) and (j) during which water may be transferred under a permit, a |
---|
86 | 86 | | district may periodically review the amount of water that may be |
---|
87 | 87 | | transferred under the permit and may limit the amount if additional |
---|
88 | 88 | | factors considered in Subsection (f) warrant the limitation, |
---|
89 | 89 | | subject to Subsection (c). The review described by this subsection |
---|
90 | 90 | | may take place not more frequently than the period provided for the |
---|
91 | 91 | | review or renewal of regular permits issued by the district. In its |
---|
92 | 92 | | determination of whether to renew a permit issued under this |
---|
93 | 93 | | section, the district shall consider relevant and current data for |
---|
94 | 94 | | the conservation of groundwater resources and shall consider the |
---|
95 | 95 | | permit in the same manner it would consider any other permit in the |
---|
96 | 96 | | district. |
---|
97 | 97 | | (l) A district is prohibited from using revenues obtained |
---|
98 | 98 | | under Subsection (e) to prohibit the transfer of groundwater |
---|
99 | 99 | | outside of a district. A district is not prohibited from using |
---|
100 | 100 | | revenues obtained under Subsection (e) for paying expenses related |
---|
101 | 101 | | to enforcement of this chapter or district rules. |
---|
102 | 102 | | (m) A district may not prohibit the export of groundwater if |
---|
103 | 103 | | the purchase was in effect on or before June 1, 1997. |
---|
104 | 104 | | (n) This section applies only to a transfer of water that is |
---|
105 | 105 | | permitted after September 1, 1997. |
---|
106 | 106 | | (o) A district shall adopt rules as necessary to implement |
---|
107 | 107 | | this section but may not adopt rules expressly prohibiting the |
---|
108 | 108 | | export of groundwater]. |
---|
109 | 109 | | (p) Subsection (e) does not apply to a district that is |
---|
110 | 110 | | collecting an export fee or surcharge on March 1, 2001. |
---|
111 | 111 | | [(q) In applying this section, a district must be fair, |
---|
112 | 112 | | impartial, and nondiscriminatory.] |
---|
113 | 113 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
114 | 114 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
115 | 115 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
116 | 116 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
117 | 117 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|