Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3597 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/12/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R14907 T
 By: Keffer H.B. No. 3597


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to exports of groundwater from a groundwater conservation
 district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  SECTION 1. Section 36.122, Water Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 36.122.  EXPORT [TRANSFER] OF GROUNDWATER OUT OF
 DISTRICT. (a) If an application for a permit or an amendment to a
 permit under Section 36.113 proposes the export [transfer] of
 groundwater outside of a district's boundaries, the district may
 also consider the provisions of this section in determining whether
 to grant or deny the permit or permit amendment.
 (b)  A district may promulgate rules requiring a person to
 obtain a permit or an amendment to a permit under Section 36.113
 from the district [for the transfer of] to export groundwater [out
 of the district] to:
 (1)  increase, on or after March 2, 1997, the amount of
 groundwater to be [transferred] exported under a continuing
 arrangement in effect before that date; or
 (2)  [transfer] export groundwater [out of the
 district] on or after March 2, 1997, under a new arrangement.
 (c)  Except as provided in Section 36.113(e), the district
 may not impose more restrictive permit conditions on [transporters]
 exporters than the district imposes on existing in-district users.
 The district may not deny a permit based on the fact that the
 applicant seeks to export groundwater. A district may not prohibit
 the export of groundwater.
 (d)  The district may impose a reasonable fee for processing
 an application under this section. The fee may not exceed fees that
 the district imposes for processing other applications under
 Section 36.113. An application filed to comply with this section
 shall be considered and processed under the same procedures as
 other applications for permits under Section 36.113 and shall be
 combined with applications filed to obtain a permit for in-district
 water use under Section 36.113 from the same applicant.
 (e)  The district may impose an export [a reasonable] fee or
 surcharge [for an export fee] using one of the following methods:
 (1)  a fee negotiated between the district and the
 exporter [transporter];
 (2)  a rate not to exceed the equivalent of the
 district's tax rate per hundred dollars of valuation for each
 thousand gallons of water exported from [transferred out of] the
 district or 2.5 cents per thousand gallons of water, if the district
 assesses a tax rate of less than 2.5 cents per hundred dollars of
 valuation; or
 (3)  for a fee-based district, a 50 percent export
 surcharge, in addition to the district's production fee, for water
 exported from [transferred out of] the district.
 [(f)     In reviewing a proposed transfer of groundwater out of
 the district, the district shall consider:
 (1)     the availability of water in the district and in
 the proposed receiving area during the period for which the water
 supply is requested;
 (2)     the projected effect of the proposed transfer on
 aquifer conditions, depletion, subsidence, or effects on existing
 permit holders or other groundwater users within the district; and
 (3)     the approved regional water plan and approved
 district management plan.
 (g)     The district may not deny a permit based on the fact that
 the applicant seeks to transfer groundwater outside of the district
 but may limit a permit issued under this section if conditions in
 Subsection (f) warrant the limitation, subject to Subsection (c)].
 (h)  In addition to conditions provided by Section 36.1131,
 the permit shall specify:
 (1)  the amount of water that may be exported from
 [transferred out of] the district; and
 (2)  the period for which the water may be exported
 [transferred].
 (i)  The period specified by Subsection (h)(2) shall be:
 (1)  at least three years if construction of a
 conveyance system has not been initiated prior to the issuance of
 the permit; or
 (2)  at least 30 years if construction of a conveyance
 system has been initiated prior to the issuance of the permit.
 (j)  A term under Subsection (i)(1) shall automatically be
 extended to the terms agreed to under Subsection (i)(2) if
 construction of a conveyance system is begun before the expiration
 of the initial term.
 [(k)     Notwithstanding the period specified in Subsections
 (i) and (j) during which water may be transferred under a permit, a
 district may periodically review the amount of water that may be
 transferred under the permit and may limit the amount if additional
 factors considered in Subsection (f) warrant the limitation,
 subject to Subsection (c). The review described by this subsection
 may take place not more frequently than the period provided for the
 review or renewal of regular permits issued by the district. In its
 determination of whether to renew a permit issued under this
 section, the district shall consider relevant and current data for
 the conservation of groundwater resources and shall consider the
 permit in the same manner it would consider any other permit in the
 district.
 (l)     A district is prohibited from using revenues obtained
 under Subsection (e) to prohibit the transfer of groundwater
 outside of a district. A district is not prohibited from using
 revenues obtained under Subsection (e) for paying expenses related
 to enforcement of this chapter or district rules.
 (m)     A district may not prohibit the export of groundwater if
 the purchase was in effect on or before June 1, 1997.
 (n)     This section applies only to a transfer of water that is
 permitted after September 1, 1997.
 (o)     A district shall adopt rules as necessary to implement
 this section but may not adopt rules expressly prohibiting the
 export of groundwater].
 (p)  Subsection (e) does not apply to a district that is
 collecting an export fee or surcharge on March 1, 2001.
 [(q)     In applying this section, a district must be fair,
 impartial, and nondiscriminatory.]
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.