E | 05/23/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 05/23/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4468 | |
E | 05/14/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3676 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1593 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3545 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3548 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3264 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1540 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1540 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1540 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1540 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1540 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1540 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1540 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1392 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1091 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1091 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1033 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1830 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1766 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Record vote | RV#310 | Journal Page: 1765 |
House | 04/21/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1765 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1765 | |
House | 04/20/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1737 | |
House | 04/20/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1737 | |
House | 04/20/2015 | Postponed | 4/20/15 2:00 PM | Journal Page: 1719 |
House | 04/16/2015 | Postponed | 4/20/15 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 1619 |
House | 04/16/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1619 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1530 | |
House | 04/01/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 884 | |
House | 03/19/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 884 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Filed |