Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3668 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Workman (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 3668
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 19, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 24, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 24, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of peace officer for purposes of
 intercepting or collecting information in relation to certain
 communications in an investigation conducted by an arson
 investigating unit.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1(2), Article 18.21, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended to read as follows:
 (2)  "Authorized peace officer" means:
 (A)  a sheriff or a sheriff's deputy;
 (B)  a constable or deputy constable;
 (C)  a marshal or police officer of an
 incorporated city;
 (D)  a ranger or officer commissioned by the
 Public Safety Commission or the director of the Department of
 Public Safety;
 (E)  an investigator of a prosecutor's office;
 (F)  a law enforcement agent of the Alcoholic
 Beverage Commission;
 (G)  a law enforcement officer commissioned by the
 Parks and Wildlife Commission;
 (H)  an enforcement officer appointed by the
 inspector general of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice under
 Section 493.019, Government Code; [or]
 (I)  an investigator commissioned by the attorney
 general under Section 402.009, Government Code; or
 (J)  a member of an arson investigating unit
 commissioned by a municipality, a county, or the state.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *