E
|
06/01/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
E
|
05/22/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4344
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1897
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4214
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4218
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3901
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1726
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1726
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1726
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1726
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1726
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1726
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1726
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1585
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1542
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 1388
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1388
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1060
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1796
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#322
|
Journal Page: 1795
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1795
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1795
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 949
|
House
|
03/03/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2015
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 297
|
House
|
02/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 297
|
House
|
11/24/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|