1 | | - | By: Gonzales (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 3707 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015; |
---|
3 | | - | May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business |
---|
4 | | - | and Commerce; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following |
---|
5 | | - | vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | H.B. No. 3707 |
---|
10 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 5 | | relating to cloud computing services. |
---|
12 | 6 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 7 | | SECTION 1. Section 2157.007, Government Code, is amended to |
---|
14 | 8 | | read as follows: |
---|
15 | 9 | | Sec. 2157.007. CONSIDERATION OF CLOUD [ADVANCED |
---|
16 | 10 | | INTERNET-BASED] COMPUTING SERVICE PURCHASE. (a) "Cloud [Advanced |
---|
17 | 11 | | Internet-based] computing service" has the meaning assigned by |
---|
18 | 12 | | Special Publication 800-145 issued by the United States Department |
---|
19 | 13 | | of Commerce National Institute of Standards and Technology, as the |
---|
20 | 14 | | definition existed on January 1, 2015 [means a service that |
---|
21 | 15 | | provides network access to a shared pool of configurable computing |
---|
22 | 16 | | resources on demand, including networks, servers, storage, |
---|
23 | 17 | | applications, or related technology services, that may be rapidly |
---|
24 | 18 | | provisioned and released by the service provider with minimal |
---|
25 | 19 | | effort and interaction. The term does not include |
---|
26 | 20 | | telecommunications service or the act of hosting computing |
---|
27 | 21 | | resources dedicated to a single purchaser]. |
---|
28 | 22 | | (b) A state agency may consider cloud [advanced |
---|
29 | 23 | | Internet-based] computing service options, including any cost |
---|
30 | 24 | | associated with purchasing those service options, when making |
---|
31 | 25 | | purchases for a major information resources project under Section |
---|
32 | 26 | | 2054.118. |
---|
33 | 27 | | (c) A state agency shall ensure that information resources |
---|
34 | 28 | | projects that use cloud [advanced Internet-based] computing |
---|
35 | 29 | | service options meet or exceed required state standards for |
---|
36 | 30 | | cybersecurity. |
---|
37 | 31 | | (d) Using existing resources, the department may review the |
---|
38 | 32 | | process for the coordinated development, hosting, and management of |
---|
39 | 33 | | computer software for state agencies that use cloud [advanced |
---|
40 | 34 | | Internet-based] computing services. |
---|
41 | 35 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
42 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 36 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 37 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 38 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 3707 was passed by the House on April |
---|
| 39 | + | 23, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
| 40 | + | voting. |
---|
| 41 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 42 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 43 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 3707 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
| 44 | + | 26, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
| 45 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 46 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 47 | + | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
| 48 | + | Date |
---|
| 49 | + | _____________________ |
---|
| 50 | + | Governor |
---|