Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3707 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Gonzales (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 3707
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to cloud computing services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2157.007, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 2157.007.  CONSIDERATION OF CLOUD [ADVANCED
 INTERNET-BASED] COMPUTING SERVICE PURCHASE. (a)  "Cloud [Advanced
 Internet-based] computing service" has the meaning assigned by
 Special Publication 800-145 issued by the United States Department
 of Commerce National Institute of Standards and Technology, as the
 definition existed on January 1, 2015 [means a service that
 provides network access to a shared pool of configurable computing
 resources on demand, including networks, servers, storage,
 applications, or related technology services, that may be rapidly
 provisioned and released by the service provider with minimal
 effort and interaction.     The term does not include
 telecommunications service or the act of hosting computing
 resources dedicated to a single purchaser].
 (b)  A state agency may consider cloud [advanced
 Internet-based] computing service options, including any cost
 associated with purchasing those service options, when making
 purchases for a major information resources project under Section
 2054.118.
 (c)  A state agency shall ensure that information resources
 projects that use cloud [advanced Internet-based] computing
 service options meet or exceed required state standards for
 cybersecurity.
 (d)  Using existing resources, the department may review the
 process for the coordinated development, hosting, and management of
 computer software for state agencies that use cloud [advanced
 Internet-based] computing services.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *