E
|
06/20/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/20/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
05/25/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4774
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4467
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4215
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1884
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1884
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1884
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1884
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1884
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1884
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1884
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1849
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1577
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1577
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1510
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2995
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#865
|
Journal Page: 2995
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2995
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2995
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2961
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2961
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2111
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1027
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 1027
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 890
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 890
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|