Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3724 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Herrero (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 3724
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2015;
 May 13, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the consideration of certain scientific evidence
 constituting the basis for an application for a writ of habeas
 corpus.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 11.073(d), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (d)  In making a finding as to whether relevant scientific
 evidence was not ascertainable through the exercise of reasonable
 diligence on or before a specific date, the court shall consider
 whether the field of scientific knowledge, a testifying expert's
 scientific knowledge, or a scientific method on which the relevant
 scientific evidence is based has changed since:
 (1)  the applicable trial date or dates, for a
 determination made with respect to an original application; or
 (2)  the date on which the original application or a
 previously considered application, as applicable, was filed, for a
 determination made with respect to a subsequent application.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *