E
|
06/20/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3626
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3618
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1812
|
Journal Page: 5897
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5891
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6023
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3604
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3588
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5567
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5567
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3136
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3136
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2864
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2864
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2864
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5191
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5191
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5191
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4812
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 V. Taylor
|
Journal Page: 2357
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2357
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2357
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1946
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1510
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2992
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#861
|
Journal Page: 2991
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2991
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2991
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2959
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Amended
|
1-S. Davis
|
Journal Page: 2959
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2959
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1829
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1373
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to General Investigating & Ethics
|
|
Journal Page: 891
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 891
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|