LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB3736
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB3736
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB3736
Compare Versions
HB3736 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3736 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3736 Enrolled June 1, 2015
HB3736 Comm Sub May 23, 2015
HB3736 Engrossed May 11, 2015
HB3736 Comm Sub April 21, 2015
HB3736 Introduced March 17, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB3736 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3736 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3736 Enrolled June 1, 2015
HB3736 Comm Sub May 23, 2015
HB3736 Engrossed May 11, 2015
HB3736 Comm Sub April 21, 2015
HB3736 Introduced March 17, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare