Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3747 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Phillips (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 3747
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 11, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 19, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of a concealed handgun license to certain
 retired judicial officers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 411.201(a), Government Code, is amended
 by amending Subdivision (2) and adding Subdivision (3) to read as
 follows:
 (2)  "Federal judge" means:
 (A)  a judge of a United States court of appeals;
 (B)  a judge of a United States district court;
 (C)  a judge of a United States bankruptcy court;
 or
 (D)  a magistrate judge of a United States
 district court.
 (3)  "Retired judicial officer" means:
 (A)  a visiting [special] judge appointed under
 Section 26.023 or 26.024; [or]
 (B)  a senior judge designated under Section
 75.001 or a judicial officer as designated or defined by Section
 75.001, 831.001, or 836.001; or
 (C)  a retired federal judge who is a resident of
 this state.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *