E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5692
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5697
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2852
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5040
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5041
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1623
|
Journal Page: 5040
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5040
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4772
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2332
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2332
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2332
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2332
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2332
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2332
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2332
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1944
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 1624
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1624
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1591
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3548
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1008
|
Journal Page: 3294
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3294
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3294
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3212
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3209
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Amended
|
3-Romero
|
Journal Page: 3212
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#974
|
Journal Page: 3211
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
2-Romero
|
Journal Page: 3209
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3208
|
House
|
05/09/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#686
|
Journal Page: 2680
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2680
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2451
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 918
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 918
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|