LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB3777
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB3777
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB3777
Compare Versions
HB3777 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3777 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3777 Enrolled May 29, 2015
HB3777 Comm Sub May 22, 2015
HB3777 Engrossed May 13, 2015
HB3777 Comm Sub May 4, 2015
HB3777 Introduced March 17, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB3777 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3777 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3777 Enrolled May 29, 2015
HB3777 Comm Sub May 22, 2015
HB3777 Engrossed May 13, 2015
HB3777 Comm Sub May 4, 2015
HB3777 Introduced March 17, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare