Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1555
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3140
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3137
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#919
|
Journal Page: 3139
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3139
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3139
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3126
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3126
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3014
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2966
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Subcommittee meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1960
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Referred directly to s/c on Long-term Infrastructure Planning by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 920
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 920
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|