E
|
06/20/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/20/2015
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3626
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6023
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3603
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3603
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3615
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5724
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3587
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5567
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5567
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3132
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3132
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2565
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2565
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2565
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4840
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4840
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4840
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4336
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1880
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1880
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1880
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1880
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1880
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1880
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1880
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Lucio
|
Journal Page: 1880
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1880
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1879
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1849
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1575
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1575
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1458
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2839
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#758
|
Journal Page: 2839
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2839
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2839
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2817
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2817
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2015
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 299
|
House
|
02/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 299
|
House
|
11/25/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|