LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB382
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB382
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB382
Compare Versions
HB382 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB382 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB382 Enrolled June 1, 2015
HB382 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
HB382 Engrossed May 11, 2015
HB382 Comm Sub May 1, 2015
HB382 Introduced November 25, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
HB382 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB382 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB382 Enrolled June 1, 2015
HB382 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
HB382 Engrossed May 11, 2015
HB382 Comm Sub May 1, 2015
HB382 Introduced November 25, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare