E
|
06/17/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
05/25/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4774
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4467
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4217
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1874
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1874
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1874
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1874
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1874
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1874
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1874
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1675
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1625
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1299
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1299
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1131
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2064
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1953
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#375
|
Journal Page: 1952
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1952
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1952
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1907
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Price
|
Journal Page: 1906
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1906
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Postponed
|
4/23/15 9:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 1774
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1774
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1581
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2015
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1051
|
House
|
03/27/2015
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 1051
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 922
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 922
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|