Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3823 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Price, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Rodríguez) H.B. No. 3823
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House April 28, 2015;
3- May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
4- and Human Services; May 15, 2015, reported favorably by the
5- following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 15, 2015, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 3823
72
83
9- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
104 AN ACT
115 relating to rate-setting and data collection processes under the
126 program of all-inclusive care for the elderly.
137 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
148 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 32, Human Resources Code,
159 is amended by adding Sections 32.0532, 32.0533, and 32.0534 to read
1610 as follows:
1711 Sec. 32.0532. PACE PROGRAM REIMBURSEMENT METHODOLOGY. (a)
1812 In this section and Sections 32.0533 and 32.0534, "PACE program"
1913 means the program of all-inclusive care for the elderly (PACE)
2014 established under Section 32.053.
2115 (b) In setting the reimbursement rates under the PACE
2216 program, the executive commissioner shall ensure that:
2317 (1) reimbursement rates for providers under the
2418 program are adequate to sustain the program; and
2519 (2) the program is cost-neutral or costs less when
2620 compared to the cost to serve a population in the STAR + PLUS
2721 Medicaid managed care program that is comparable in:
2822 (A) age;
2923 (B) eligibility factors, including:
3024 (i) income level;
3125 (ii) health status; and
3226 (iii) impairment level;
3327 (C) geographic location;
3428 (D) living environment; and
3529 (E) other factors determined to be necessary.
3630 (c) For purposes of Subsection (b)(2), the commission shall
3731 consider data on the cost of services provided to comparable
3832 recipients enrolled in the STAR + PLUS Medicaid managed care
3933 program to calculate the upper payment limit component of the PACE
4034 program reimbursement rates. The cost of those services includes
4135 the Medicaid capitation payment per recipient and Medicaid payments
4236 made on a fee-for-service basis for services not covered by the
4337 capitation payment.
4438 Sec. 32.0533. DATA COLLECTION: PACE AND STAR + PLUS
4539 MEDICAID MANAGED CARE PROGRAMS. The commission, in collaboration
4640 with the Department of Aging and Disability Services and
4741 appropriate stakeholder groups, shall modify the methods by which
4842 the commission and the department collect data for evaluation of
4943 the PACE and STAR + PLUS Medicaid managed care programs to allow
5044 comparison of recipient outcomes between the programs. The
5145 modification to data collection methods must include changes to:
5246 (1) survey instruments that measure recipient
5347 experience;
5448 (2) compilation of the same or similar complaint,
5549 disenrollment, and appeals data; and
5650 (3) compilation of the same or similar hospital
5751 admissions and readmissions data.
5852 Sec. 32.0534. EVALUATION AND REPORT COMPARING PACE AND STAR
5953 + PLUS MEDICAID MANAGED CARE PROGRAMS. (a) The commission, in
6054 collaboration with the Department of Aging and Disability Services
6155 and appropriate stakeholder groups, shall conduct an evaluation of
6256 the PACE program that compares Medicaid costs and client outcomes
6357 under the PACE program to Medicaid costs and client outcomes under
6458 the STAR + PLUS Medicaid managed care program. The commission must
6559 design the evaluation in a manner that:
6660 (1) compares similar recipient types between the
6761 programs in terms of recipient:
6862 (A) age;
6963 (B) eligibility factors, including:
7064 (i) income level;
7165 (ii) health status; and
7266 (iii) impairment level; and
7367 (C) living environment; and
7468 (2) accounts for differences among recipients in:
7569 (A) geographic location;
7670 (B) health care acuity; and
7771 (C) other factors determined to be necessary.
7872 (b) The evaluation required under this section must include
7973 an assessment of future cost implications if the commission fails
8074 to establish a reimbursement methodology under the PACE program in
8175 accordance with Section 32.0532.
8276 (c) The commission shall compile a report on the findings of
8377 the evaluation under this section. Not later than December 1, 2016,
8478 the commission shall submit the report to the Legislative Budget
8579 Board and the governor.
8680 (d) This section expires September 1, 2017.
8781 SECTION 2. If before implementing any provision of this Act
8882 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
8983 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
9084 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
9185 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
9286 waiver or authorization is granted.
9387 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
9488 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
9589 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
9690 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
9791 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
98- * * * * *
92+ ______________________________ ______________________________
93+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
94+ I certify that H.B. No. 3823 was passed by the House on April
95+ 27, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 134, Nays 0, 1 present, not
96+ voting.
97+ ______________________________
98+ Chief Clerk of the House
99+ I certify that H.B. No. 3823 was passed by the Senate on May
100+ 22, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
101+ ______________________________
102+ Secretary of the Senate
103+ APPROVED: _____________________
104+ Date
105+ _____________________
106+ Governor