E | 06/17/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 06/17/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6049 | |
E | 05/27/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5213 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2559 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4807 | |
House | 05/26/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4984 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4574 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1977 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1977 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1977 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1976 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1976 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1976 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1976 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1944 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 1337 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1337 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1261 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2344 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2150 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2147 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Record vote | RV#448 | Journal Page: 2150 |
House | 04/30/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2150 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2150 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2132 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2132 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1783 | |
House | 04/14/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 923 | |
House | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 923 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Filed |