Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3842 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Smithee (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 3842
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources and Economic Development; May 22, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 1; May 22, 2015, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an agreement to finance and build a conference center
 and other appropriate facilities in or near a state park.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 13, Parks and Wildlife
 Code, is amended by adding Section 13.0046 to read as follows:
 Sec. 13.0046.  COOPERATION WITH INSTITUTIONS OF HIGHER
 EDUCATION. (a) In this section, "institution of higher education"
 has the meaning assigned by Section 61.003, Education Code.
 (b)  The commission may enter into a joint agreement with the
 governing board of an institution of higher education to finance
 and build a conference center and other appropriate related
 facilities to be located in or near a state park.
 (c)  A facility built under this section must be operated
 cooperatively to provide benefits to the department and the
 institution of higher education in accomplishing the purposes of
 the department and the institution.
 (d)  The commission and an institution of higher education
 may use any funds, property, or other assets available to finance
 and build a facility under this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to an agreement entered
 into on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *