House | 05/11/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3112 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Subcommittee meeting cancelled | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1960 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Referred directly to s/c on Long-term Infrastructure Planning by chair | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 924 | |
House | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 924 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Filed |