Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3868 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Moody (Senate Sponsor - Rodríguez) H.B. No. 3868
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 12, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of Westside Drive in El Paso County as
 the Don Juan de Onate Trail.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 442, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 442.030 to read as follows:
 Sec. 442.030.  DON JUAN DE ONATE TRAIL AS TEXAS HISTORIC
 HIGHWAY.  (a)  The commission shall cooperate with the Texas
 Department of Transportation to designate, interpret, and market
 Westside Drive in El Paso County as the Don Juan de Onate Trail and a
 Texas historic highway.
 (b)  To supplement revenue available for the purposes under
 Subsection (a), the commission and the Texas Department of
 Transportation may pursue federal funds dedicated to highway
 enhancement.
 (c)  A designation of Westside Drive in El Paso County as the
 Don Juan de Onate Trail and a Texas historic highway may not be
 construed as a designation under the National Historic Preservation
 Act (16 U.S.C. Section 470 et seq.).
 (d)  The Texas Department of Transportation is not required
 to design, construct, or erect a marker under this section unless a
 grant or donation of funds is made to the department to cover the
 cost of the design, construction, and erection of the marker.  Money
 received to cover the cost of the marker shall be deposited to the
 credit of the state highway fund.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *