Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB389 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Bell, Keough, Metcalf (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 389
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 April 23, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 5, 2015, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 5, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Montgomery County Hospital District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 1063.051(c) and (d), Special District
 Local Laws Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (c)  An election shall be held on the uniform election date
 in November [May] of each even-numbered year to elect the
 appropriate number of directors.
 (d)  Directors serve staggered four-year terms that expire
 on the last day of December [second Tuesday in June].
 SECTION 2.  Section 1063.112, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 1063.112.  CONSTRUCTION CONTRACTS. A construction
 contract that involves the expenditure of more than the amount
 provided by Section 271.024, Local Government Code, [$10,000] may
 be made only after advertising in the manner provided by Subchapter
 B, Chapter 271 [Chapter 252 and Subchapter C, Chapter 262], Local
 Government Code.
 SECTION 3.   The board of directors of the Montgomery County
 Hospital District shall adjust the terms of office to conform to a
 change in the election date made by this Act.
 SECTION 4.   This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *