E | 06/19/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 06/19/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6049 | |
E | 05/30/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6025 | |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3504 | |
House | 05/29/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5564 | |
House | 05/28/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5571 | |
House | 05/28/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4983 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2576 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2576 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2576 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2576 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2576 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2576 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2576 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2404 | |
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2155 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1692 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1692 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1468 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3267 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Record vote | RV#758 | Journal Page: 2841 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2841 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2841 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2823 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2823 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2559 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 977 | |
House | 03/24/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 977 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Filed |