Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3901 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Miller of Fort Bend H.B. No. 3901
 (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Collin)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 19, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 26, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 26, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the repossession of an aircraft.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Title 4, Property Code, is amended by adding
 Chapter 30 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 30.  WRIT OF ASSISTANCE FOR REPOSSESSION OF AIRCRAFT
 Sec. 30.01.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Aircraft" means a self-propelled motor vehicle
 that can be used to transport a person by flight in the air.
 (2)  "Repossession" means the recovery of an aircraft
 that has been sold under a security agreement containing a
 repossession clause authorizing the lender to recover the aircraft
 if the borrower defaults under the agreement.
 (3)  "Repossession agent" means an individual who is
 authorized to engage in a repossession for a lender.
 Sec. 30.02.  WRIT OF ASSISTANCE FOR REPOSSESSION OF
 AIRCRAFT. (a)  A writ of assistance for the repossession of an
 aircraft authorizes a peace officer to assist and protect a
 repossession agent in gaining possession of the aircraft while the
 agent:
 (1)  secures the aircraft on site; or
 (2)  prepares the aircraft, which may include a
 mechanical inspection, for removal from the site by flight or
 otherwise to another location.
 (b)  A writ of assistance for the repossession of an aircraft
 is valid for 30 days.
 (c)  A justice court may grant unlimited extensions of a writ
 of assistance issued under this chapter.
 Sec. 30.03.  PETITION FOR WRIT OF ASSISTANCE. (a) A
 repossession agent may file a petition in a justice court for a writ
 of assistance for the repossession of an aircraft.
 (b)  The repossession agent is entitled to the writ if the
 repossession agent establishes that:
 (1)  the aircraft is subject to the proposed
 repossession; and
 (2)  the repossession agent is authorized to engage in
 the repossession.
 (c)  The petition for the writ must include a copy of:
 (1)  the security agreement relating to the aircraft;
 (2)  the notice of default under the security agreement
 sent by the lender to the borrower;
 (3)  the instrument in which a power of attorney for the
 repossession is granted to the repossession agent by the lender;
 and
 (4)  the results of a title search of the Federal
 Aviation Administration's records for the aircraft.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *