Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3911 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Paul (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 3911
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 12, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 EltifeX
 CreightonX
 EllisX
 HuffinesX
 SchwertnerX
 SeligerX
 TaylorofGalvestonX
 WatsonX
 WhitmireX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the appointment by insurers, health maintenance
 organizations, and their agents of holders of a temporary agent's
 license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 4001.162, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 4001.162.  RESTRICTION ON APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY
 LICENSE HOLDERS. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b), an [An]
 agent, insurer, or health maintenance organization may not appoint
 more than 500 temporary license holders during a calendar year.
 (b)  The commissioner shall adopt reasonable rules setting
 standards for an agent, insurer, or health maintenance organization
 to appoint more than 500 temporary license holders during a
 calendar year. The standards must include consideration of the
 ability of an agent, insurer, or health maintenance organization to
 monitor appointed temporary agents.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *