Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2438
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2025
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1556
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3147
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#926
|
Journal Page: 3146
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3146
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3146
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1829
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
|
|
Journal Page: 929
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 929
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|