Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3944 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: King of Uvalde, Moody (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 3944
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Water, and Rural Affairs; May 24, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 24, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to judicial review of final orders arising out of
 nutritional programs administrated by the Texas Department of
 Agriculture.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 12.0025, Agriculture Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 12.0025.  NUTRITION PROGRAMS. (a) The department
 shall administer the following federal and state nutrition
 programs:
 (1)  the commodity supplemental food program under 7
 U.S.C. Section 612c;
 (2)  the food distribution program under 7 U.S.C.
 Section 612c;
 (3)  the emergency food assistance program under 7
 U.S.C. Section 7501 et seq.;
 (4)  the school lunch program under 42 U.S.C. Section
 1751 et seq.;
 (5)  the summer food service program under 42 U.S.C.
 Section 1761;
 (6)  the child and adult care food program under 42
 U.S.C. Section 1766;
 (7)  the special milk program under 42 U.S.C. Section
 1772; and
 (8)  the school breakfast program under 42 U.S.C.
 Section 1773.
 (b)  A decision of the department's administrative review
 official or the State Office of Administrative Hearings is the
 final administrative determination of the department and not
 subject to judicial review.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *