House | 05/15/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3554 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 570 | Journal Page: 3553 |
House | 05/15/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1746 | |
House | 04/13/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/16/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 331 | |
House | 02/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 331 | |
House | 11/26/2014 | Filed |