84R2124 KKA-D By: González H.B. No. 405 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the creation of a task force to evaluate training provided to members of a school district board of trustees. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 11, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 11.1591 to read as follows: Sec. 11.1591. TASK FORCE ON MEMBER TRAINING. (a) A task force is established under this section to evaluate training provided to members of a school district board of trustees and the effect of that training on developing effective board of trustees leadership. (b) The task force shall be composed of members appointed by the commissioner. In making appointments, the commissioner shall ensure that the task force includes board members, superintendents, representatives of regional education service centers involved in providing training to board members, a representative of the State Board of Education, a representative of the agency, and members of the general public. (c) A representative of the agency designated by the commissioner shall serve as the presiding officer of the task force. (d) The commissioner shall appoint the members of the task force not later than December 1, 2015. (e) The presiding officer shall call the initial meeting of the task force on or before January 1, 2016. The task force shall meet at the times and places that the presiding officer determines are appropriate. The task force shall adopt rules necessary to fulfill the task force's duties under this section. (f) Chapter 2110, Government Code, does not apply to the task force. (g) The task force shall evaluate whether training currently provided to board members: (1) enables board members to effectively make decisions about school district budgets and other local school financial matters; (2) clearly delineates board member roles in guiding educational policy and promoting student achievement without engaging in daily administrative and financial details; (3) provides tools for board members, superintendents, schools, and the community to create successful district-wide initiatives and achieve active parental engagement; and (4) prepares board members to establish a climate of cooperation between the board members and superintendent that promotes a caring environment for students while maintaining high expectations. (h) The task force shall prepare a report that includes: (1) a description of the activities of the task force; (2) the findings and recommendations of the task force, including any proposed policy recommendations; and (3) any proposals for legislation or other matters the task force considers appropriate. (i) Not later than September 1, 2017, the task force shall deliver the report required by Subsection (h) to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the chair of the State Board of Education. (j) The task force is abolished and this section expires December 1, 2017. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015.