1 | 1 | | 84R2124 KKA-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: González H.B. No. 405 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the creation of a task force to evaluate training |
---|
8 | 8 | | provided to members of a school district board of trustees. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 11, Education Code, is |
---|
11 | 11 | | amended by adding Section 11.1591 to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | Sec. 11.1591. TASK FORCE ON MEMBER TRAINING. (a) A task |
---|
13 | 13 | | force is established under this section to evaluate training |
---|
14 | 14 | | provided to members of a school district board of trustees and the |
---|
15 | 15 | | effect of that training on developing effective board of trustees |
---|
16 | 16 | | leadership. |
---|
17 | 17 | | (b) The task force shall be composed of members appointed by |
---|
18 | 18 | | the commissioner. In making appointments, the commissioner shall |
---|
19 | 19 | | ensure that the task force includes board members, superintendents, |
---|
20 | 20 | | representatives of regional education service centers involved in |
---|
21 | 21 | | providing training to board members, a representative of the State |
---|
22 | 22 | | Board of Education, a representative of the agency, and members of |
---|
23 | 23 | | the general public. |
---|
24 | 24 | | (c) A representative of the agency designated by the |
---|
25 | 25 | | commissioner shall serve as the presiding officer of the task |
---|
26 | 26 | | force. |
---|
27 | 27 | | (d) The commissioner shall appoint the members of the task |
---|
28 | 28 | | force not later than December 1, 2015. |
---|
29 | 29 | | (e) The presiding officer shall call the initial meeting of |
---|
30 | 30 | | the task force on or before January 1, 2016. The task force shall |
---|
31 | 31 | | meet at the times and places that the presiding officer determines |
---|
32 | 32 | | are appropriate. The task force shall adopt rules necessary to |
---|
33 | 33 | | fulfill the task force's duties under this section. |
---|
34 | 34 | | (f) Chapter 2110, Government Code, does not apply to the |
---|
35 | 35 | | task force. |
---|
36 | 36 | | (g) The task force shall evaluate whether training |
---|
37 | 37 | | currently provided to board members: |
---|
38 | 38 | | (1) enables board members to effectively make |
---|
39 | 39 | | decisions about school district budgets and other local school |
---|
40 | 40 | | financial matters; |
---|
41 | 41 | | (2) clearly delineates board member roles in guiding |
---|
42 | 42 | | educational policy and promoting student achievement without |
---|
43 | 43 | | engaging in daily administrative and financial details; |
---|
44 | 44 | | (3) provides tools for board members, |
---|
45 | 45 | | superintendents, schools, and the community to create successful |
---|
46 | 46 | | district-wide initiatives and achieve active parental engagement; |
---|
47 | 47 | | and |
---|
48 | 48 | | (4) prepares board members to establish a climate of |
---|
49 | 49 | | cooperation between the board members and superintendent that |
---|
50 | 50 | | promotes a caring environment for students while maintaining high |
---|
51 | 51 | | expectations. |
---|
52 | 52 | | (h) The task force shall prepare a report that includes: |
---|
53 | 53 | | (1) a description of the activities of the task force; |
---|
54 | 54 | | (2) the findings and recommendations of the task |
---|
55 | 55 | | force, including any proposed policy recommendations; and |
---|
56 | 56 | | (3) any proposals for legislation or other matters the |
---|
57 | 57 | | task force considers appropriate. |
---|
58 | 58 | | (i) Not later than September 1, 2017, the task force shall |
---|
59 | 59 | | deliver the report required by Subsection (h) to the governor, the |
---|
60 | 60 | | lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, |
---|
61 | 61 | | and the chair of the State Board of Education. |
---|
62 | 62 | | (j) The task force is abolished and this section expires |
---|
63 | 63 | | December 1, 2017. |
---|
64 | 64 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
65 | 65 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
66 | 66 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
67 | 67 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
68 | 68 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|