Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB405 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 12/01/2014

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R2124 KKA-D
 By: González H.B. No. 405


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a task force to evaluate training
 provided to members of a school district board of trustees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 11, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 11.1591 to read as follows:
 Sec. 11.1591.  TASK FORCE ON MEMBER TRAINING. (a) A task
 force is established under this section to evaluate training
 provided to members of a school district board of trustees and the
 effect of that training on developing effective board of trustees
 leadership.
 (b)  The task force shall be composed of members appointed by
 the commissioner. In making appointments, the commissioner shall
 ensure that the task force includes board members, superintendents,
 representatives of regional education service centers involved in
 providing training to board members, a representative of the State
 Board of Education, a representative of the agency, and members of
 the general public.
 (c)  A representative of the agency designated by the
 commissioner shall serve as the presiding officer of the task
 force.
 (d)  The commissioner shall appoint the members of the task
 force not later than December 1, 2015.
 (e)  The presiding officer shall call the initial meeting of
 the task force on or before January 1, 2016. The task force shall
 meet at the times and places that the presiding officer determines
 are appropriate. The task force shall adopt rules necessary to
 fulfill the task force's duties under this section.
 (f)  Chapter 2110, Government Code, does not apply to the
 task force.
 (g)  The task force shall evaluate whether training
 currently provided to board members:
 (1)  enables board members to effectively make
 decisions about school district budgets and other local school
 financial matters;
 (2)  clearly delineates board member roles in guiding
 educational policy and promoting student achievement without
 engaging in daily administrative and financial details;
 (3)  provides tools for board members,
 superintendents, schools, and the community to create successful
 district-wide initiatives and achieve active parental engagement;
 and
 (4)  prepares board members to establish a climate of
 cooperation between the board members and superintendent that
 promotes a caring environment for students while maintaining high
 expectations.
 (h)  The task force shall prepare a report that includes:
 (1)  a description of the activities of the task force;
 (2)  the findings and recommendations of the task
 force, including any proposed policy recommendations; and
 (3)  any proposals for legislation or other matters the
 task force considers appropriate.
 (i)  Not later than September 1, 2017, the task force shall
 deliver the report required by Subsection (h) to the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives,
 and the chair of the State Board of Education.
 (j)  The task force is abolished and this section expires
 December 1, 2017.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.