House | 05/11/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1706 | |
House | 04/13/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 938 | |
House | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 938 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Filed |