Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4130 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Gonzales (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 4130
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the qualifications and method of electing directors of
 the Jonah Water Special Utility District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle C, Title 6, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended by adding Chapter 7218 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 7218.  JONAH WATER SPECIAL UTILITY DISTRICT
 SUBCHAPTER A.  GENERAL PROVISIONS
 Sec. 7218.001.  DEFINITIONS.  In this chapter:
 (1)  "Board" means the board of directors of the
 district.
 (2)  "Director" means a member of the board.
 (3)  "District" means the Jonah Water Special Utility
 District.
 SUBCHAPTER B. BOARD OF DIRECTORS
 Sec. 7218.051.  COMPOSITION OF BOARD.  The district is
 governed by a board of nine directors.
 Sec. 7218.052.  DIRECTOR ELIGIBILITY. To be eligible to be
 listed on the ballot as a candidate for or to serve as a director, a
 person must be:
 (1)  a resident of the district; and
 (2)  a retail water or sewer service customer of the
 district.
 Sec. 7218.053.  ELECTION OF DIRECTORS FROM SINGLE-MEMBER
 DISTRICTS.  (a)  The board by rule may provide for the election of
 some or all of the directors from single-member districts.
 (b)  In addition to the qualifications required by Section
 7218.052, if the board provides for the election of some or all of
 the directors from single-member districts, to be eligible to be
 listed on the ballot as a candidate for  or to serve as a director
 from  a single-member district, a person must be a resident of that
 district.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by Sections 7218.052 and
 7218.053, Special District Local Laws Code, as added by this Act, do
 not affect the entitlement of a member serving on the board of
 directors of the Jonah Water Special Utility District immediately
 before the effective date of this Act to continue to carry out the
 board's functions for the remainder of the member's term. The
 changes in law apply only to a member elected on or after the
 effective date of this Act. This Act does not prohibit a person who
 is a member of the board on the effective date of this Act from being
 reelected to the board if the person has the qualifications
 required for a member under Sections 7218.052 and 7218.053, Special
 District Local Laws Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  (a) The legal notice of the intention to
 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
 Government Code.
 (b)  The governor, one of the required recipients, has
 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (c)  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives within the required time.
 (d)  All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
 and accomplished.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *