E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5564
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4982
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2403
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1786
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1535
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1535
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1458
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2966
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2698
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#702
|
Journal Page: 2698
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2698
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2698
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2630
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Amended
|
1-S. Thompson and Riddle
|
Journal Page: 2629
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2629
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1062
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 404
|
House
|
02/19/2015
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 404
|
House
|
02/16/2015
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 332
|
House
|
02/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 332
|
House
|
12/01/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|