House | 05/12/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3123 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 2031 | Journal Page: 3123 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2112 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1532 | |
House | 04/13/2015 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 1528 | |
House | 04/13/2015 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 1528 | |
House | 04/10/2015 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 1491 | |
House | 04/10/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1491 | |
House | 04/06/2015 | Filed | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Record vote | RV#166 | Journal Page: 1372 |
House | 04/06/2015 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 1372 |