E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3626
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3618
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5821
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1788
|
Journal Page: 5820
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5810
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6023
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3594
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3532
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5693
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5693
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3398
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3398
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3394
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3394
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3394
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5500
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5500
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5500
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4983
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Campbell
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2587
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2587
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2587
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2587
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2577
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2577
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2025
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1624
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1624
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1557
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3140
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3137
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#919
|
Journal Page: 3140
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3140
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3140
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3126
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3126
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3014
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3112
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 2560
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Referred to Special Purpose Districts
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|