LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB4175
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB4175
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB4175
Compare Versions
HB4175 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB4175 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB4175 Enrolled June 1, 2015
HB4175 Comm Sub May 24, 2015
HB4175 Engrossed May 12, 2015
HB4175 Comm Sub May 11, 2015
HB4175 Introduced April 7, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB4175 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB4175 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB4175 Enrolled June 1, 2015
HB4175 Comm Sub May 24, 2015
HB4175 Engrossed May 12, 2015
HB4175 Comm Sub May 11, 2015
HB4175 Introduced April 7, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare