House | 05/13/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3111 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2060 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Referred to Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 2003 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2003 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Filed | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1952 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Record vote | RV#374 | Journal Page: 1951 |
House | 04/27/2015 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 1951 |