E
|
05/28/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
E
|
05/20/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4088
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3785
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3846
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3571
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1392
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1122
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1122
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 957
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1707
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#233
|
Journal Page: 1599
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1599
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1599
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1589
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1589
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2015
|
Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
|
|
Journal Page: 333
|
House
|
02/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 333
|
House
|
12/02/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|