Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB431 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: White of Tyler, Miles H.B. No. 431
2- (Senate Sponsor - Rodríguez)
3- (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
4- April 27, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
5- Affairs; May 6, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
6- Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 6, 2015, sent to printer.)
7-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 431
82
93
10- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
114 AN ACT
125 relating to the creation of an advisory committee to examine and
136 recommend revisions to any state laws pertaining to juvenile
147 records.
158 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
169 SECTION 1. DEFINITIONS. In this Act:
1710 (1) "Advisory committee" means the Juvenile Records
1811 Advisory Committee appointed under Section 2 of this Act.
1912 (2) "Board" means the Texas Juvenile Justice Board.
2013 SECTION 2. JUVENILE RECORDS ADVISORY COMMITTEE. Not later
2114 than December 1, 2015, the board shall appoint an advisory
2215 committee to develop a plan for studying, reorganizing, and
2316 comprehensively revising Chapter 58, Family Code, and any other
2417 relevant laws pertaining to juvenile records.
2518 SECTION 3. APPOINTMENTS; PRESIDING OFFICER. (a) In making
2619 appointments to the advisory committee, the board shall include
2720 members who are interested parties, including:
2821 (1) chief juvenile probation officers;
2922 (2) juvenile prosecutors;
3023 (3) juvenile defense attorneys;
3124 (4) juvenile court judges;
3225 (5) justice court or municipal court judges;
3326 (6) court administrators or court clerks;
3427 (7) peace officers;
3528 (8) representatives of the Department of Public
3629 Safety;
3730 (9) representatives of the Department of Family and
3831 Protective Services;
3932 (10) representatives of the Texas Juvenile Justice
4033 Department;
4134 (11) juvenile justice advocates;
4235 (12) individuals with expertise in federal records and
4336 federal immigration policy;
4437 (13) members of the public; and
4538 (14) any other individuals that the board considers
4639 necessary to accomplish the duties of the advisory committee.
4740 (b) The board shall designate one of the members as
4841 presiding officer of the advisory committee.
4942 SECTION 4. REPORT. (a) Not later than November 1, 2016,
5043 the advisory committee shall submit to the legislature and the
5144 board the recommendations for revisions to Chapter 58, Family Code,
5245 and any other relevant laws pertaining to juvenile records and a
5346 copy of the plan developed by the committee under Section 2 of this
5447 Act to produce those recommendations.
5548 (b) The advisory committee may submit:
5649 (1) preliminary recommendations at any time before
5750 submitting the report required under Subsection (a) of this
5851 section; and
5952 (2) follow-up recommendations at any time after
6053 submitting the report required under Subsection (a) of this
6154 section.
6255 SECTION 5. COMPENSATION. Members of the advisory committee
6356 serve without compensation and are not entitled to reimbursement
6457 for expenses.
6558 SECTION 6. APPLICATION OF LAWS GOVERNING ADVISORY
6659 COMMITTEES. The advisory committee is not subject to Chapter 2110,
6760 Government Code.
6861 SECTION 7. EXPIRATION DATE. The advisory committee is
6962 abolished and this Act expires December 31, 2018.
7063 SECTION 8. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
7164 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
7265 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
7366 Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
7467 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
75- * * * * *
68+ ______________________________ ______________________________
69+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
70+ I certify that H.B. No. 431 was passed by the House on April
71+ 16, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 2 present, not
72+ voting.
73+ ______________________________
74+ Chief Clerk of the House
75+ I certify that H.B. No. 431 was passed by the Senate on May
76+ 15, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
77+ ______________________________
78+ Secretary of the Senate
79+ APPROVED: _____________________
80+ Date
81+ _____________________
82+ Governor