E
|
06/17/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6048
|
E
|
05/29/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5697
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3106
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5207
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5212
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4763
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2320
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2320
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2320
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2320
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2320
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2320
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2320
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1850
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1842
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1609
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1609
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1550
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3137
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#919
|
Journal Page: 3136
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3136
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3136
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3116
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3116
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2111
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 301
|
House
|
02/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 301
|
House
|
12/09/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|